HI HB749 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB749
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to EEP, HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to EEP, HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health and the counties to consider waste-to-energy as part of their solid waste management practices and processing methods in implementing the Hawaii Integrated Solid Waste Management Act. (HB749 HD2)
Title
Relating To Solid Waste.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to EEP, HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 580) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-02-16 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2017-02-14 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-16-17 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT. |
2017-01-31 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Say, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto. |
2017-01-30 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-31-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to EEP, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB749 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).