HI HB748 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-08 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-08 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the Hawaii constitution to authorize the State to issue special purpose revenue bonds and use the proceeds from the bonds to assist agricultural enterprises.
Title
Constitutional Amendment; SPRBS; Agricultural Enterprises (ConAm)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3). |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 248), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Tokioka. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-07-13 9:15AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to AGR, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |