HI HB746 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies the purposes of the elections observer program and the duty of the chief election officer to implement and maintain the program.
Title
Elections Observer Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4). |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 345), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Ito, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kawakami, C. Lee, McDermott. |
2013-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-08-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=746&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB746_.HTM |