HI HB741 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB741
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the department of education for the expansion of civic education in the public schools. Establishes two full-time equivalent permanent civic education resource teacher positions. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Civic Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 584) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-14 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Kapela, Martinez, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Garcia. |
2023-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-14-23 2:15PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB750 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB741 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
HB741 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=741&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB741_HD1_.HTM |