HI HB740 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB740
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires real estate investment trusts to submit returns based on dividends distributed based on income generated in Hawaii and repeals the dividend paid deduction for real estate investment trusts.
Title
Relating To Real Estate Investment Trusts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EDB, JUD/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB740 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to EDB, JUD/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=740&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB740_.HTM |