HI HB740 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the counties to enter into contracts with dealers and rental car companies for the registration of used cars.
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration; Used Cars
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Jo Jordan [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1). |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 286), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-11 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Har, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Tupola. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-11-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB233 (Same As) 2015-05-07 - Act 047, on 5/6/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=740&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB740_.HTM |