HI HB74 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of electric personal assistive mobility devices on sidewalks in business districts, except when used by a police officer or person with a disability.
Title
Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device; Business District; Prohibited; Exceptions
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=74&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB74_.HTM |