HI HB738 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB738
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes fuel cell electric vehicles in the definition of "electric vehicles" for purposes of parking exemptions, HOV lane use, registration, and required parking spaces in places of public accommodation. Grants procurement priority for fuel cell electric vehicles for state and county vehicle purchases. (HB738 HD1)
Title
Relating To Fuel Cell Electric Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to TRE/GVO, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 144). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 884), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino. |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-28-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from TRN/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 619) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN/LAB on Wednesday, 02-08-17 11:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to TRN/LAB, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB738 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to TRE/GVO, WAM.