HI HB731 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB731
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers to provide employees access to seizure first aid information specified by the department of labor and industrial relations.
Title
Relating To Public Health.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB731 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB936 (Same As) 2021-07-02 - Act 150, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1252).
SB936 (Same As) 2021-07-02 - Act 150, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1252).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=731&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB731_.HTM |