HI HB726 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB726
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the fines for violations for operating a vehicle after the person's license to operate the vehicle has been suspended or revoked for operating the vehicle under the influence of an intoxicant.
Title
Relating To Highway Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB726 (Carry Over) 2017-01-25 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=726&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB726_.HTM |