HI HB718 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of human services to compile information regarding employers having employees who receive public assistance and to submit a report to the legislature on the 50 employers with the highest number of employees receiving public assistance. Requires the department of labor and industrial relations to share employment data with the department of human services. Effective 7/1/2060. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2021-03-25SenateReported from HMS/LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1253) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2021-03-23SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-03-23SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-03-17SenateThe committee(s) on HMS/LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
2021-03-09SenateReferred to HMS/LCA, JDC/WAM.
2021-03-09SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-03-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 133).
2021-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-03-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 802), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2021-02-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-19HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 628), recommending referral to FIN.
2021-02-17HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har.
2021-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-10HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1).
2021-02-10HouseReported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 133) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2021-02-05HouseThe committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Har, Kapela, LoPresti, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates.
2021-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Friday, 02-05-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-25HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback