HI HB712 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts NELHA from the state procurement code when purchasing replacement parts and repair and maintenance services for equipment associated with the seawater delivery system unless agreement requires otherwise.
Title
Natural Energy Laboratory of Hawaii Authority; Procurement; Seawater Systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-13-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=712&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB712_.HTM |