HI HB703 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB703
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits owners of vacant undeveloped land to cause or permit visible fugitive dust to become airborne from their land or to cause or permit visible fugitive dust that originates from their vacant developed land to be discharged beyond their land's lot line. Requires owners of vacant undeveloped land to submit to the Department of Health a Fugitive Dust Mitigation Plan no later than December 31, 2023, and every three years thereafter, and obtain approval from the Director of Health. Requires the Department of Health to adopt rules and submit reports to the Legislature.
Title
Relating To Fugitive Dust Control.
Sponsors
Rep. Terez Amato [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1252 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB703 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 3
HB703 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=703&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB703_.HTM |