HI HB7 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, M. Lee, Saiki; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aquino, Keith-Agaran, Pine; 5 Noes: Representative(s) Awana, Hanohano, Nakashima, Souki, Takumi; and Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, M. Lee, Saiki; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aquino, Keith-Agaran, Pine; 5 Noes: Representative(s) Awana, Hanohano, Nakashima, Souki, Takumi; and Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes Voluntary Employees' Beneficiary Association trust law permanent.
Title
VEBA; Sunset
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, M. Lee, Saiki; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aquino, Keith-Agaran, Pine; 5 Noes: Representative(s) Awana, Hanohano, Nakashima, Souki, Takumi; and Excused: none. | |
2010-02-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-09-10 9:30am in House conference room 309. | |
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=7&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB7_.HTM |