HI HB680 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB680
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the use of traditional Hawaiian burial practices in the treatment and disposal of human remains, which includes the use of alkaline hydrolysis and natural organic reduction. Amends procedures for the resolution of disputes regarding the right of disposition, right to rely and act upon written instructions in a funeral service agreement or similar documents, and provisions for the disposition of a decedent's remains and recovery of reasonable expenses to include hydrolysis facilities and natural organic reduction facilities. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Human Remains.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-25-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 517) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to CPC. |
2021-02-16 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Tokioka. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1). |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 129) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB680 (Carry Over) 2021-02-25 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.