HI HB680 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB680
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an organization that is exempt from federal taxation under IRC section 501(c)(4) to submit semi-annual reports to the campaign spending commission if the organization expends funds to make communications that advocate for or against elected officials or their positions on government actions.
Title
Relating To Internal Revenue Code Section 501(c)(4) Organizations.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-19. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB680 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=680&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB680_.HTM |