HI HB674 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Act 099, 06/21/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1200).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Act 099, 06/21/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1200).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the percentage requirements for the Hawaii public housing authority related to the admission of applicants, with or without preferences, into federal and state low-income public housing units. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Public Housing Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-21 | Senate | Act 099, 06/21/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1200). |
2023-06-21 | House | Act 099, on 06/21/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1200). |
2023-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900). |
2023-05-02 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993). |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 78). |
2023-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 78) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha. |
2023-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Marten, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-23 10:25AM in conference room 224. |
2023-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-23 10:25AM in conference room 224. |
2023-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-23 10:30AM in conference room 224. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Hashimoto, Aiu Co-Chairs; Marten, Matsumoto. |
2023-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909). |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Chang Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; Kanuha. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 666). |
2023-04-06 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 665) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-23. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1592) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-23 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1187) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Aquino, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-23 1:01PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 172). |
2023-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 971), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-24 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garrett. |
2023-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1). |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 386) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-08 | House | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Kila, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 02-08-23 9:30AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |