HI HB674 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes provisions for charter schools relating to annual independent financial audits, criminal history record checks, enrollment, conflicts of interest, and hiring. Makes amendments to Hawaii's Charter School Law for clarity and consistency. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB674 HD2)
Title
Education; Charter Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EDU/JDL, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 254). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 867) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-13 11:30AM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 519) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takai, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-06-13 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |