HI HB67 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB67
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to establish an unspecified number of fulltime equivalent positions for the University of Hawaii Windward Community College's Pu`uhonua Program. Effective 6/30/3000. (SD2)
Title
Making An Appropriation For The Pu`uhonua Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457). |
2024-03-22 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2024-03-20 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340). |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 3:20PM; Conference Room 229. |
2023-04-26 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-27-23 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Perruso, Chun Co-Chairs; Marten, Garcia. |
2023-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 931). |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Wakai, Kanuha Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800). |
2023-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2023-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 713) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1841) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, Wakai, Fevella. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1371) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fukunaga, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/PSM added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-22-23 3:17PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HRE/PSM, WAM. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 24). |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 890), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-22 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Alcos. |
2023-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1). |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 324) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-08 | House | The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Quinlan, Woodson, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2023-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-08-23 2:15PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-13 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
HB67 (Carry Over) 2023-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.
Subjects
Appropriations ($)
Halawa Correctional Facility
Hawaii Youth Correctional Facility
Positions
Pu`uhonua Program
UH
Windward Community College
Women's Community Correctional Center
Halawa Correctional Facility
Hawaii Youth Correctional Facility
Positions
Pu`uhonua Program
UH
Windward Community College
Women's Community Correctional Center