HI HB661 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of human services to report to the legislature on costs and benefits of requiring random drug testing for recipients of public assistance program benefits. (HB661 HD1)
Title
Random Drug Testing; Welfare Applicants; Report
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Denny Coffman [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] |
Rep. Roland Sagum [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Takai, Takumi excused (3). | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 324) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Mizuno, Yamane; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Bertram; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Shimabukuro. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-12-09 8:00am in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |