HI HB657 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes an excise tax equal to $3.20 per ounce of tobacco in each article or item of tobacco products, other than large cigars. Allocates monies generated to certain special funds and the general fund. Effective July 1, 2013. (HB657 HD1)
Title
Tobacco Products; Excise Tax; Special Funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Evans, Hanohano, Ing, McKelvey, Rhoads voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Tokioka excused (2). |
2013-02-14 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 423) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-05 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Nakashima, Ohno, Takai, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Takumi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-05-13 2:10PM in conference room 309. |
2013-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-13. |
2013-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 01-31-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB492 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.