HI HB649 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB649
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen excused (2).
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen excused (2).
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the teacher home assistance program within HHFDC to provide housing vouchers to full-time DOE teachers (including public charter school teachers) who teach in hard-to-fill schools and whose household income does not exceed eighty percent of the area's median income. (HB649 HD1)
Title
Relating To Teacher Housing Subsidies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 46) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LHE. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Hashimoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to HSG, LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB649 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen excused (2).