HI HB64 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits as disorderly conduct the operation of yard equipment between 8:00 p.m. and 8:00 a.m. on any day of the week.
Title
Noise; Yard Equipment
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Herkes voting no (1) and Representative(s) Bertram, Takai, Takumi excused (3). | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 302) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Chang, Chong, Har, Ito, Luke; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Herkes, Sagum, Thielen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Ching. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-12-09 9:00am in House conference room 325. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Referred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB597 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.