HI HB638 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-08 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-08 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals eligibility for ERS, EUTF, and cafeteria plan benefits for officers and employees of the Office of Hawaiian Affairs who are paid in whole or in part by funds derived from the public land trust described in section 10-3, HRS. States that all employees of the Office of Hawaiian Affairs shall be subject to the Uniform Information Practices Act (Modified). Effective January 1, 2113. (HB638 HD1)
Title
Office of Hawaiian Affairs; Employee Benefits; Office of Information Practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Friday, 02-08-13 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on OMH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4). |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 81) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to OMH. |
2013-01-29 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-29-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB, OMH, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |