HI HB637 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB637
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to AGR/LHE/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to AGR/LHE/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of education and Hawaii community development authority to develop programs that provide incentives to establish gardens on school campuses and within housing projects and communities.
Title
Relating To Gardens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to AGR/LHE/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB637 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to AGR/LHE/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5
SB303 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
SB303 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=637&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB637_.HTM |