HI HB634 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB634
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Judiciary to establish a 5-year pilot program for restorative justice. Requires the judiciary to inform various criminal attorneys of the existence of the pilot program. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Restorative Justice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 02-01-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB634 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB737 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
SB737 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=634&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB634_.HTM |