HI HB631 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Act 226, on 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1335).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Act 226, on 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1335).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the documentation required when requesting the Department of Health to issue a new birth certificate with a sex designation change. (HB631 CD1)
Title
New Birth Certificate; Sex Designation
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | House | Act 226, on 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1335). |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Act 226, 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1335). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Choy, Cullen, Fukumoto Chang, Har, Ito, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Pouha, Tokioka, Tsuji, Tupola, Ward voting no (14) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 22 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere . 3 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Harimoto, Slom. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 47). |
2015-04-30 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 47) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-30 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Keith-Agaran, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Rhoads, C. Lee; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 3:05PM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 8:45AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-27-15 8:45AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-24-15 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Baker. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Rhoads Co-Chairs; C. Lee, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 564) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kidani, Kouchi, Riviere . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1524) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-06-15 9:25AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1043) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-15 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDL. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 216). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Kawakami, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Choy, Cullen, Har, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Pouha, Tupola, Ward voting no (10) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 899) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-24 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kawakami; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2015-02-23 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-24-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Fukumoto Chang, Har, Matsumoto, Oshiro, Pouha, Tokioka, Ward, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 572) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-18 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-18-15 8:35AM in conference room 329. |
2015-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-18-15 at 8:35am. |
2015-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-13-15 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |