HI HB631 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes display on qualified food offered for retail sale a label stating "not genetically engineered" or "does not include a genetically engineered ingredient" if the statement is true. Makes an untrue statement a violation. Allows any person or public agency to seek an injunction to prevent or terminate a violation.
Title
Food Labeling; "Not Genetically Engineered", "Does Not Include a Genetically Engineered Ingredient"
Sponsors
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 02-04-13 11:00AM in House conference room Auditorium. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=631&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB631_.HTM |