HI HB630 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB630
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes e-liquid and electronic smoking devices within the definition of "tobacco products", as used in the cigarette tax and tobacco tax law. Establishes a tax of twenty per cent for the wholesale price for electronic smoking devices and 10 cents for each milliliter of e-liquid. Allocates a portion of funds collected on excise taxes on electronic smoking devices and eliquids to the trauma system special fund, community health centers special fund, and emergency medical services special fund.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB630 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB894 (Same As) 2021-02-09 - The committee(s) on HTH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-10-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
SB894 (Same As) 2021-02-09 - The committee(s) on HTH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-10-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=630&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB630_.HTM |