HI HB623 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals Act 67, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018, relating to alternative energy research and development and grants by HTDC. Repeals Act 141, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018, relating to the Research and Development Program in HTDC. (HB623 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Hawaii Technology Development Corporation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateThe committee on EET deferred the measure.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 3:15PM in conference room 414.
2019-03-12SenateRe-Referred to EET, WAM.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to EET/TEC, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 63).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 838), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, McDermott.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 518) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:00AM in conference room 309.
2019-02-11HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-13-19 10:10AM in conference room 309.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:10AM in House conference room 309.
2019-02-06HouseThe committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until next week Wednesday, 02/13/19.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:00AM in conference room 309.
2019-02-01HouseThe committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-19.
2019-01-30HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-01-19 10:00AM in conference room 309.
2019-01-30HouseThe committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-19 10:00AM.
2019-01-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 01-30-19 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-24HouseReferred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB370 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to TEC/EET, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback