HI HB619 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB619
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public school students to complete a course in ethnic studies. Requires the superintendent of education to develop a model curriculum in ethnic studies, circulate the curriculum for public comment, and obtain approval of the curriculum from the board of education. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Ethnic Studies.
Sponsors
Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 348) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-09-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB619 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).