HI HB612 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB612
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the superintendent of education, or the superintendent's designee, to serve as the summer learning coordinator and coordinate all summer programs for children. Requires the summer learning coordinator to work with the department of human services to leverage federal funds for school-based summer programs. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 461) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Gates, Hashimoto, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden, Okimoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-09-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB612 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
SB812 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
SB812 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.