HI HB612 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB612
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the Aging and Disability Resource Center. (HB612 HD1)
Title
Making An Appropriation For The Aging And Disability Resource Center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 270) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Har, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Har, Kobayashi, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB533 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB612 (Carry Over) 2017-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
HB612 (Carry Over) 2017-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).