HI HB612 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits disclosure of votes cast in a postponed election. Authorizes discretionary withholding of election results unrelated to postponement. Clarifies Governor's emergency postponement authority. Limits postponement period to seven days after an election. (HB612 HD2)
Title
Emergencies and Disasters; Postponed Elections; Disclosure of Election Results
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 211). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Ing voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Tupola voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 820) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Souki excused (2). |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 358) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-12-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |