HI HB610 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB610
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Education to develop programs to encourage the development of gardens on school property. Authorizes the Hawaii Community Development Authority to develop programs that provide incentives to establish gardens in housing projects, communities, and schools.
Title
Relating To Gardens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-04-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EDN, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB610 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB463 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to EDN, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 22
SB463 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to EDN, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 22
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=610&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB610_.HTM |