HI HB607 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB607
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the ALOHA homes program to develop low-cost homes on state-owned and county-owned land in urban redevelopment sites to be sold in leasehold by the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation (HHFDC) to qualified residents. Exempts certain land from the definition of public lands. Requires HHFDC to gain legislative approval before disposing of certain lands. Requires HHFDC to transfer a number of ALOHA homes units to the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands or Office of Hawaiian Affairs. Provides for the disposition of lands acquired by HHFDC but no longer needed for the ALOHA homes program. Requires HHFDC to develop an ALOHA homes demonstration project by July 1, 2026. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB607 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB607 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=607&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB607_.HTM |