HI HB607 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB607
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the ALOHA homes program to develop low-cost homes on state-owned and county-owned land in urban redevelopment sites to be sold in leasehold by the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation (HHFDC) to qualified residents. Exempts certain land from the definition of public lands. Requires HHFDC to gain legislative approval before disposing of certain lands. Requires HHFDC to transfer a number of ALOHA homes units to the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands or Office of Hawaiian Affairs. Provides for the disposition of lands acquired by HHFDC but no longer needed for the ALOHA homes program. Requires HHFDC to develop an ALOHA homes demonstration project by July 1, 2026. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB607 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB1 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to HSG, WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
SB1 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to HSG, WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=607&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB607_.HTM |