HI HB605 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - (H) Act 189, on 7/5/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1293).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - (H) Act 189, on 7/5/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1293).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a reduced ignition propensity cigarette program special fund for the state fire council to administer and provide staff for the reduced ignition propensity cigarette program. Effective July 1, 2011. (HB605 CD1)
Title
Fire Protection; Reduced Ignition Propensity Cigarette Program Special Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] |
Rep. Joey Manahan [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-07 | (H) Act 189, on 7/5/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1293). | |
2011-07-07 | (S) Act 189, 7/5/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1293). | |
2011-05-06 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 22 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz . 3 No(es): Senator(s) Kim, Slom, Solomon. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-04-29 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 87). | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 87) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-28 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Morikawa, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 2:30PM in conference room 312. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 2:30PM in conference room 312. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-11 2:30PM in conference room 312. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Ryan. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Aquino, Cullen Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Yamane, Fontaine. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 484) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Kim, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1160) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Kim, Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 927) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-11 3:00PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to PGM, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 136). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 767) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Riviere, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-26 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-28-11 5:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2011-02-24 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-11 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chong, Nakashima excused (2). | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Reported from PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 411) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Souki, Takai, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine, Johanson; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 02-03-11 8:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to PBM, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |