HI HB604 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB604
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the sunset date for Act 168, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012, authorizing certain incentives and actions by the Department of Transportation regarding electric vehicles.
Title
Relating To Electric Vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] |
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB111 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB604 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 5
HB604 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=604&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB604_.HTM |