HI HB599 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tuition waiver program within the nursing scholars program administered by UH. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Nursing Scholars Program; Tuition Waiver; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=599&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB599_.HTM |