HI HB595 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes applicable to noncandidate committees the present limit on campaign contributions to a candidate or candidate committee from nonresident persons.
Title
Campaign Contributions; Noncandidate Committees, Limit from Nonresident Persons
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Denny Coffman [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Jo Jordan [D] | Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] |
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-12-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-13 at 2:00pm. |
2013-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-08-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=595&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB595_.HTM |