HI HB593 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-25-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Hearing: Feb 25 @ 2:00 pm in Conference Room 329 Via Videoconference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expands the definition of "beer" to specify an alcohol by volume of no less than 0.5 percent and to include alcoholic seltzer beverages. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Alcohol.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-12 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-25-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-18HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
2021-02-18HouseReported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 441) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2021-02-12HouseThe committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2021-02-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-12-21 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to ECD, CPC, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB565 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback