HI HB593 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB593
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the development of utility scale solar projects on class A agricultural lands, subject to certain requirements. Repeals 6/30/2025. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Land Use.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:25AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1), and referred to WAM, with Senators Harimoto, Ihara, Moriwaki, Riviere, Ruderman, and Thielen voting "No"; and Senators English, Fevella, and Kim voting "Aye, with reservations". |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from WTL/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1338) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to WTL/EET, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 202). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Creagan, Gates, Holt, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Okimoto, Onishi, Perruso, Quinlan, Tarnas, Thielen voting no (13) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1129), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Holt, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Gates, McDermott; 6 Noes: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from EEP/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 703) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on EEP/WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19 11:30AM. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WLH on Tuesday, 02-12-19 8:55AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-29 | House | Re-referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to EEP/WLH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB593 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
SB1008 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
SB1008 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.