HI HB592 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB592
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the sunset date of the Alternative Energy Research and Development Pilot Program to June 30, 2019. Appropriates funds for the Program. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2018-03-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 4:15 PM in Conference Room 225. |
2017-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 3:10PM in conference room 225. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 3:10PM in conference room 225. |
2017-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 3:10PM in conference room 225. |
2017-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-17 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Taniguchi, Dela Cruz Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Nakashima, Lowen Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 545). |
2017-04-07 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 496) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-17. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1329) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from TRE/ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1045) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 2:00PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to TRE/ETT, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 121). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 921), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Tupola. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from EEP/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 443) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Johanson, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Matsumoto. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/EDB on Tuesday, 02-14-17 11:01AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to EEP/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB682 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB592 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 4:15 PM in Conference Room 225.
HB592 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 4:15 PM in Conference Room 225.