HI HB589 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB589
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Judiciary to retain mental health services and substance abuse treatment for the Hawaii's Opportunity Probation with Enforcement program, which is an intensive supervisory program for persons on probation. (HB589 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Judiciary.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 118). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 962), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Tupola. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 130) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, Morikawa, Nakashima, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Oshiro, McDermott. |
2017-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-01-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB589 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to JDL, WAM.