HI HB588 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB588
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Public Utilities Commission to establish reliability standards and interconnection requirements for certain renewable energy projects; provided that any costs for changes in reliability standards or interconnection requirements shall not be the responsibility of the interconnection customer after the interconnection customer's power purchase agreement has been approved by the Public Utilities Commission. Requires the Public Utilities Commission to distinguish between interconnection facilities and utility network upgrades; ensure that the cost of interconnection facilities is the responsibility of the interconnection customer; and ensure that the cost of utility network upgrades is the sole responsibility of the transmission provider. Establishes a timeline and requirements for interconnection procedures to be established by the Public Utilities Commission for certain utility-scale renewable energy projects. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-15 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-15-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima, Woodson excused (3). |
2023-02-02 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-01-31 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-31-23 8:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB588 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB839 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB839 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Interconnection Facilities
Interconnection Requirements
Public Utility Commission
Reliability Standards
Renewable Energy
Utility Network Upgrades
Interconnection Requirements
Public Utility Commission
Reliability Standards
Renewable Energy
Utility Network Upgrades
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=588&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB588_HD1_.HTM |