HI HB58 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-24 - (H) Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-24 - (H) Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOT to establish and operate a county-wide highway traffic advisory radio system to advise motorists of updated current traffic conditions in any county having a population of greater than 300,000. Appropriation.
Title
Traffic Advisory Radio System; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB780 (Same As) 2011-01-28 - (S) The committee on TIA deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=58 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB58_.HTM |