HI HB576 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Act 003, 04/12/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1103).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Act 003, 04/12/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1103).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes advanced practice registered nurses to perform medication or aspiration abortions. (HD3)
Title
Relating To Health Care.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | Act 003, 04/12/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1103). |
2021-04-14 | House | Act 003, on 04/12/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1103). |
2021-03-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-03-29 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 458). |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Misalucha . Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-29-21. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1178) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Nishihara, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Misalucha ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-21 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH/CPN. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 235). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Eli, Har, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (9) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 910) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-04 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Tokioka. |
2021-03-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-04-21 2:15PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-03 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-04-21. |
2021-03-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-03-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-02 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-03-21. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-02-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Gates, Kitagawa, Quinlan, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 633) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to JHA. |
2021-02-17 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kitagawa; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Kong, Matsumoto; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Har, Holt, Kitagawa, Quinlan, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1). |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 138) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-05 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Har, Kapela, LoPresti, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Friday, 02-05-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB624 (Same As) 2021-02-08 - The committee(s) on HTH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-10-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.