HI HB576 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes class A and B felony sex trafficking offenses and provisions related to prosecution of the offenses. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB576 HD1)
Title
Sex Trafficking Offenses; Crime
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] |
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. George Fontaine [R] |
Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Kymberly Pine [R] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 529) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Belatti, Hanohano, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Ching. | |
2011-02-14 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-17-11 10:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB959 (Same As) 2011-01-24 - (S) Referred to JDL.