HI HB572 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB572
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that prior to the adoption, amendment, or repeal of an administrative rule, electronic notice of the proposed rulemaking be provided to all persons who have made a timely written request to, and provided a valid working email address to, the adopting agency for advance notice of its rulemaking proceedings. Requires that alterations to administrative rules be displayed in Ramseyer format and the full text of rules be made available in a digitally accessible and searchable format. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Administrative Rulemaking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-16-23 3:00PM; CR 225. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 61). |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-02 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 932), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-16 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1). |
2023-02-13 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 316) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-02-07 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 02-07-23 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB572 (Carry Over) 2023-03-16 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.